VA HB2020 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Nomination of candidates for elected offices; restrictions on nomination method selected by political party. Provides that a method of nomination for elected office may not be selected if such method will have the practical effect of excluding participation in the nominating process by qualified voters who are unable to attend meetings because they are (i) a member of a uniformed service on active duty, (ii) temporarily residing outside of the United States, (iii) a student attending a school or institution of higher education, (iv) a person with a disability, or (v) a person who has a communicable disease of public health threat or who may have come in contact with a person with such disease.. However, such restriction does not apply when selecting a candidate for a special election or nominating a candidate, or in the event that no candidate files the required paperwork by the prescribed deadline. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nomination of candidates for elected offices; restrictions on nomination method selected.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101479D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242509(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback