VA HB2020 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2020
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nomination of candidates for elected offices; restrictions on nomination method selected by political party. Provides that a method of nomination for elected office may not be selected if such method will have the practical effect of excluding participation in the nominating process by qualified voters who are otherwise eligible to participate in the process under the party's rules but are unable to attend meetings because they are (i) a member of a uniformed service on active duty, (ii) temporarily residing outside of the United States, (iii) a student attending a school or institution of higher education, (iv) a person with a disability, or (v) a person who has a communicable disease of public health threat or who may have come in contact with a person with such disease. However, such restriction does not apply when selecting a candidate for a special election or nominating a candidate, or in the event that no candidate files the required paperwork by the prescribed deadline. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024. Nomination of candidates for elected offices; restrictions on nomination method selected by political party. Provides that a method of nomination for elected office may not be selected if such method will have the practical effect of excluding participation in the nominating process by qualified voters who are otherwise eligible to participate in the process under the party's rules but are unable to attend meetings because they are (i) a member of a uniformed service on active duty, (ii) temporarily residing outside of the United States, (iii) a student attending a school or institution of higher education, (iv) a person with a disability, or (v) a person who has a communicable disease of public health threat or who may have come in contact with a person with such disease. However, such restriction does not apply when selecting a candidate for a special election or nominating a candidate, or in the event that no candidate files the required paperwork by the prescribed deadline. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024.
Title
Nomination of candidates for elected offices; restrictions on nomination method selected.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Don Scott [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 1-N 4-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 1-N 4-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 474 (effective 1/1/24) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2020ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (53-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 10-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 1-N 4-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101479D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2020 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)