VA HB2006 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fair Housing Law; rights and responsibilities with respect to the use of an assistance animal in a dwelling. Sets out the rights and responsibilities under the Virginia Fair Housing Law (§ 36-96.1 et seq.) with respect to maintaining an assistance animal in a dwelling. The bill establishes a process through which a person with a disability may submit a request for a reasonable accommodation to maintain an assistance animal in a dwelling, including any supporting documentation verifying the disability and disability-related need for an accommodation. Under the bill, a request for reasonable accommodation to maintain an assistance animal may be denied for any one of the following reasons: (i) the requester does not have a disability; (ii) the requester does not have a disability-related need for an assistance animal; (iii) the accommodation imposes an undue financial and administrative burden on the person receiving the request; or (iv) the accommodation would fundamentally alter the nature of the operations of the person receiving the request. The bill provides that whenever a request for a reasonable accommodation to maintain an assistance animal in a dwelling is denied for reasons other than that the requester does not have a disability or a disability-related need for an assistance animal, an interactive process shall be initiated to determine if there is an alternative accommodation that would effectively address the disability-related need. The bill also defines "assistance animal," "major life activities," "therapeutic relationship," and "physical or mental impairment." The bill provides that if any provision of its provisions is determined by the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development to be not substantially equivalent or otherwise inconsistent with the federal Fair Housing Act of 1968, 42 U.S.C. § 3601 et seq., as amended, such provision shall not be enforceable. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission. This bill is identical to SB 1228.
Title
Va. Fair Housing Law; responsibilities with respect to use of an assistance animal in a dwelling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 91-N) (Y: 3 N: 91 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 91-N) (Y: 3 N: 91 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2006ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference substitute printed 17105862D-H1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Suetterlein, Sturtevant |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Carr, Peace, Helsel |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-22 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 91-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105420D-S1 (3-Y 91-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2006S1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105420D-S1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105420D-S1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103597D |