VA HB2006 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School divisions; concussion policies and procedures; management plan. Requires each local school division to establish a management plan for implementation of and compliance with its policies and procedures regarding the identification and handling of suspected concussions in student-athletes.
Title
School divisions; concussion policies and procedures; management plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Education |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102509D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2006 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2006+hil |