VA HB1995 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1995

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Rare Disease Council and Rare Disease Council Fund; report. Creates the Rare Disease Council for the purpose of (i) advising the Governor and the General Assembly on the needs of individuals with rare diseases in the Commonwealth; (ii) identifying challenges that such individuals face, including delays in obtaining a diagnosis or the receipt of a misdiagnosis, shortages of medical specialists who can provide treatment, and lack of access to therapies and medication used to treat rare diseases; (iii) funding research related to rare diseases and the development of new treatments for rare diseases; and (iv) funding for supports for persons with rare diseases in the Commonwealth. The bill also creates the Rare Disease Council Fund to be used for the purpose of (a) funding research related to rare diseases and the development of new treatments for rare diseases and supports for persons with rare diseases in the Commonwealth and (b) supporting the work of the Rare Disease Council. Rare Disease Council and Rare Disease Council Fund; report. Creates the Rare Disease Council for the purpose of (i) advising the Governor and the General Assembly on the needs of individuals with rare diseases in the Commonwealth; (ii) identifying challenges that such individuals face, including delays in obtaining a diagnosis or the receipt of a misdiagnosis, shortages of medical specialists who can provide treatment, and lack of access to therapies and medication used to treat rare diseases; (iii) funding research related to rare diseases and the development of new treatments for rare diseases; and (iv) funding for supports for persons with rare diseases in the Commonwealth. The bill also creates the Rare Disease Council Fund to be used for the purpose of (a) funding research related to rare diseases and the development of new treatments for rare diseases and supports for persons with rare diseases in the Commonwealth and (b) supporting the work of the Rare Disease Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rare Disease Council and Rare Disease Council Fund; created, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
2021-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 303 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1995ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-11SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1995H1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103655D-H1
2021-01-27HouseRead second time
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103655D-H1
2021-01-25HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-19HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101216D

Same As/Similar To

HB1995 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32173.14(n/a)See Bill Text
32173.15(n/a)See Bill Text
32173.16(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1995
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1995+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1995H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1995ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0303+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1995F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1995FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1995FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0042+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0205C0002+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0029+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1214+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0093+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0033+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0068+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0114HB1995+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0136HB1995+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0137HB1995+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0138HB1995+HB1995

Bill Comments

feedback