VA HB1995 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Rare Disease Council and Rare Disease Council Fund; report. Creates the Rare Disease Council for the purpose of (i) advising the Governor and the General Assembly on the needs of individuals with rare diseases in the Commonwealth; (ii) identifying challenges that such individuals face, including delays in obtaining a diagnosis or the receipt of a misdiagnosis, shortages of medical specialists who can provide treatment, and lack of access to therapies and medication used to treat rare diseases; (iii) funding research related to rare diseases and the development of new treatments for rare diseases; and (iv) funding for supports for persons with rare diseases in the Commonwealth. The bill also creates the Rare Disease Council Fund to be used for the purpose of (a) funding research related to rare diseases and the development of new treatments for rare diseases and supports for persons with rare diseases in the Commonwealth and (b) supporting the work of the Rare Disease Council. Rare Disease Council and Rare Disease Council Fund; report. Creates the Rare Disease Council for the purpose of (i) advising the Governor and the General Assembly on the needs of individuals with rare diseases in the Commonwealth; (ii) identifying challenges that such individuals face, including delays in obtaining a diagnosis or the receipt of a misdiagnosis, shortages of medical specialists who can provide treatment, and lack of access to therapies and medication used to treat rare diseases; (iii) funding research related to rare diseases and the development of new treatments for rare diseases; and (iv) funding for supports for persons with rare diseases in the Commonwealth. The bill also creates the Rare Disease Council Fund to be used for the purpose of (a) funding research related to rare diseases and the development of new treatments for rare diseases and supports for persons with rare diseases in the Commonwealth and (b) supporting the work of the Rare Disease Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rare Disease Council and Rare Disease Council Fund; created, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1995H1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103655D-H1
2021-01-27HouseRead second time
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103655D-H1
2021-01-25HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-19HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101216D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32173.14(n/a)See Bill Text
32173.15(n/a)See Bill Text
32173.16(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1995
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1995+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1995H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103655.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1995F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1995FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0033+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0042+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0205V0002+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0029+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1214+HB1995
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0093+HB1995

Bill Comments 750

feedback