VA HB199 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legislation affecting local government expenditures or reductions. Requires the Division of Legislative Services to identify and forward to the Commission on Local Government (Commission) introduced joint resolutions calling for a study of local government expenditures or revenues. The bill also authorizes the Department of Planning and Budget and the Department of Taxation to forward to the Commission introduced bills that require additional local government expenditures or a reduction in local government revenues.
Title
Local government expenditures or reductions; DLS to identify legislation affecting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 69-N) (Y: 28 N: 71 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 69-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (28-Y 69-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-04 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB199ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101787D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Taxation
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Taxation