VA HB1963 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Taxable income; deduction for payment of certain tolls. Allows a qualified taxpayer to deduct from his Virginia adjusted gross income an amount equal to 50 percent of the amount paid by the taxpayer for tolls in a qualified locality. A qualified locality is one in which the unemployment rate is higher than the statewide average and (i) in which a public-private transportation project that includes tolling is located or (ii) that is adjacent to a locality in which such a project is located. A qualified taxpayer is a taxpayer who resides in a qualified locality.
Title
Income tax, state; deduction for payment of tolls in qualified locality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #1 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102360D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1963 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1963+hil |