VA HB195 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Summary
Subdivision plats. Clarifies definitions related to subdivision plats and preliminary subdivision plats.
Title
Subdivision plats; clarifies definitions related thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 718 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB195ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 083050260-S1 (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB195S1 | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083050260-S1 | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083050260-S1 | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-24 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-23 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-23 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-22 | House: Printed as engrossed 082008672-E | |
2008-01-22 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB195E | |
2008-01-22 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-01-22 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-18 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 2-N) | |
2007-12-26 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2007-12-26 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082008672 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB195 |