VA HB1940 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1940
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; guidelines on excused student absences; civic engagement. Provides that, subject to guidelines established by the Department of Education, each school board (i) shall permit one school day-long excused absence per school year for any middle school or high school student in the local school division who is absent from school to engage in a civic event and (ii) may permit additional excused absences for such students who are absent for such purposes. The bill also provides that local school boards may require that the student provide advance notice of the intended absence and require that the student provide documentation of participation in a civic event.
Title
Students; guidelines on excused student absences, civic engagement.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 104 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1940ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 38-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (61-Y 38-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (26-Y 13-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 37-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1940H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Substitute by Delegate Rasoul agreed to 21103483D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Floor substitute printed 21103483D-H1 (Rasoul) |
2021-01-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100543D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1940 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
SB1439 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
SB1439 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
SB1439 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
SB1439 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)