VA HB1940 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Education; guidelines on excused student absences; civic or political engagement. Provides that, subject to guidelines established by the Department of Education, each school board (i) shall permit one school day-long excused absence per school year for any middle school or high school student in the local school division who is absent from school to engage in a civic or political event and (ii) may permit additional excused absences for such students who are absent for such purposes. Department of Education; guidelines on excused student absences; civic or political engagement. Provides that, subject to guidelines established by the Department of Education, each school board (i) shall permit one school day-long excused absence per school year for any middle school or high school student in the local school division who is absent from school to engage in a civic or political event and (ii) may permit additional excused absences for such students who are absent for such purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students; guidelines on excused student absences, civic or political engagement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (62-Y 37-N)
2021-01-21HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB1940H1
2021-01-21HouseSubstitute by Delegate Rasoul agreed to 21103483D-H1
2021-01-21HouseRead second time
2021-01-21HouseFloor substitute printed 21103483D-H1 (Rasoul)
2021-01-20HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-19HouseRead first time
2021-01-18HouseReported from Education (17-Y 5-N)
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100543D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221254(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback