VA HB1932 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1932
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Left in Rehabilitation and Social Services
Pending: Senate Rehabilitation and Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Left in Rehabilitation and Social Services
Pending: Senate Rehabilitation and Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Child-placing agencies; conscience clause; repeal. Repeals provisions that allow child-placing agencies to refuse to perform, assist with, counsel, recommend, consent to, refer, or participate in any child placements when the proposed placement violates the agency's written religious or moral convictions or policies. The bill provides that any child-placing agency that operates pursuant to the provisions of the conscience clause prior to February 1, 2021, may continue to do so until January 1, 2022, but only with regard to placements made prior to February 1, 2022. Child-placing agencies; conscience clause; repeal. Repeals provisions that allow child-placing agencies to refuse to perform, assist with, counsel, recommend, consent to, refer, or participate in any child placements when the proposed placement violates the agency's written religious or moral convictions or policies. The bill provides that any child-placing agency that operates pursuant to the provisions of the conscience clause prior to February 1, 2021, may continue to do so until January 1, 2022, but only with regard to placements made prior to February 1, 2022.
Title
Child-placing agencies; conscience clause.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Left in Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Recommitted to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200177D-S1 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101283D-E |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1932E |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101283D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1932 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)