VA HB1932 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Child-placing agencies; conscience clause; repeal. Repeals provisions that allowed child-placing agencies to refuse to perform, assist with, counsel, recommend, consent to, refer, or participate in any child placements when the proposed placement would violate the agency's written religious or moral convictions or policies. The bill provides that any child-placing agency that operated pursuant to the provisions of the conscience clause prior to February 1, 2021, may continue to do so until January 1, 2022, but only with regard to placements made prior to February 1, 2022. Child-placing agencies; conscience clause; repeal. Repeals provisions that allowed child-placing agencies to refuse to perform, assist with, counsel, recommend, consent to, refer, or participate in any child placements when the proposed placement would violate the agency's written religious or moral convictions or policies. The bill provides that any child-placing agency that operated pursuant to the provisions of the conscience clause prior to February 1, 2021, may continue to do so until January 1, 2022, but only with regard to placements made prior to February 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child-placing agencies; conscience clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 43-N)
2021-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 21101283D-E
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1932E
2021-02-02HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101283D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321709.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1932
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1932+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1932E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1932AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103280A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1932F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1932FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1204V0010+HB1932
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0087+HB1932
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1382+HB1932
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S09V0045+HB1932

Bill Comments

feedback