VA HB1888 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1888
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0471)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0471)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; procedural and process reforms; availability and accessibility reforms; penalty. Makes various reforms to absentee voting processes and procedures, including those related to availability and accessibility. The bill requires certain actions to be taken to process absentee ballots returned before the day of an election, including verifying the correct completion of the voter affirmation statement, and provides for an opportunity for an absentee voter to make corrections to the statement in certain circumstances. The bill requires the establishment of drop-off locations for the return of voted absentee ballots. Additionally, a central absentee voter precinct is required to be established in each locality; currently, establishment is optional. On the day of the election, officers of election are required to begin processing absentee ballots in the central absentee voter precincts prior to the close of polls, but no ballot vote counts are permitted to be transmitted outside of the central absentee voter precinct before the close of polls; a violation of such prohibition is a Class 1 misdemeanor. When reporting election results to the Department of Elections, the general registrars are required to report absentee ballots cast early in person separately from all other absentee ballots. Additionally, a voter who has applied for and received an absentee ballot may choose to instead vote at his polling place on election day, and such voter shall be entitled to cast a provisional ballot. The bill requires a ballot marking tool with screen reader assistive technology to be made available for absentee voters with a print disability. Restrictions on the availability of absentee voting for first-time voters who registered by mail are repealed. The bill contains technical amendments for organizational and readability purposes. Absentee voting; procedural and process reforms; availability and accessibility reforms; penalty. Makes various reforms to absentee voting processes and procedures, including those related to availability and accessibility. The bill requires certain actions to be taken to process absentee ballots returned before the day of an election, including verifying the correct completion of the voter affirmation statement, and provides for an opportunity for an absentee voter to make corrections to the statement in certain circumstances. The bill requires the establishment of drop-off locations for the return of voted absentee ballots. Additionally, a central absentee voter precinct is required to be established in each locality; currently, establishment is optional. On the day of the election, officers of election are required to begin processing absentee ballots in the central absentee voter precincts prior to the close of polls, but no ballot vote counts are permitted to be transmitted outside of the central absentee voter precinct before the close of polls; a violation of such prohibition is a Class 1 misdemeanor. When reporting election results to the Department of Elections, the general registrars are required to report absentee ballots cast early in person separately from all other absentee ballots. Additionally, a voter who has applied for and received an absentee ballot may choose to instead vote at his polling place on election day, and such voter shall be entitled to cast a provisional ballot. The bill requires a ballot marking tool with screen reader assistive technology to be made available for absentee voters with a print disability. Restrictions on the availability of absentee voting for first-time voters who registered by mail are repealed. The bill contains technical amendments for organizational and readability purposes.
Title
Absentee voting; procedural and process reforms, availability and accessibility reforms, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0471) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 471 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1888ER) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1888ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200269D-S1 (53-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1888S1 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200269D-S1 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200269D-S1 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101608D-E |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1888E |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-13 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101608D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1888 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 103.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 653.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 667.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |