VA HB1886 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public-Private Transportation Act; finding of public interest. Establishes the requirements for a finding of public interest and requires such a finding prior to an initiation of procurement. The bill also establishes the Transportation Public-Private Partnership Advisory Committee to determine by a majority vote whether a VDOT or Department of Rail and Public Transportation project meets the finding of public interest and to report such determination to the General Assembly. The bill also requires certification of the finding prior to the execution of a comprehensive agreement and requires the public-private partnership guidelines to incorporate the finding. The bill also requires VDOT to establish (i) a process for identifying high-risk projects and (ii) procurement processes and guidelines for such projects to ensure that the public interest is protected.
Title
Public-Private Transportation Act; establishes requirement for finding of public interest.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1886ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105238D-S1 (97-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1886S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105238D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105238D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1886H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15103884D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103884D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103395D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 1803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1803.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1803.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1820 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |