VA HB188 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health care services; payment estimates. Requires hospitals and practitioners licensed by the Board of Medicine to provide a patient or the representative of a patient scheduled to receive a nonemergency procedure, test, or service to be performed by the hospital or practitioner with an estimate of the payment amount for which the patient will be responsible no later than one week after the scheduling of such procedure, test, or service. Currently, only hospitals are required to provide such estimate, and such estimate is required only (i) for elective procedures, tests, or services; (ii) within three days of the procedure, test, or service; and (iii) upon request of the patient or his representative.
Title
Health care services; payment estimates.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100999D |
Same As/Similar To
HB188 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 137.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2973.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB188 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB188+hil |