VA HB188 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB188

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Health care services; payment estimates. Requires hospitals and practitioners licensed by the Board of Medicine to provide a patient or the representative of a patient scheduled to receive a nonemergency procedure, test, or service to be performed by the hospital or practitioner with an estimate of the payment amount for which the patient will be responsible no later than one week after the scheduling of such procedure, test, or service. Currently, only hospitals are required to provide such estimate, and such estimate is required only (i) for elective procedures, tests, or services; (ii) within three days of the procedure, test, or service; and (iii) upon request of the patient or his representative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care services; payment estimates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseContinued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-22HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2019-12-26HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-12-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100999D

Same As/Similar To

HB188 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321137.05(n/a)See Bill Text
5412973.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback