VA HB1878 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Possession and administration of naloxone; regional jail employees. Adds employees of regional jails to the list of individuals who may possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist, provided that they have completed a training program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naloxone; possession and administration by regional jail employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1878ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-21HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-17HouseRead first time
2019-01-15HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101428D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413408(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback