VA HB1865 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local transportation districts. Provides for membership in local transportation districts not only by whole counties and cities, but also by portions of counties and cities. The bill also allows members of local transportation districts to set terms upon which their memberships will cease, and allows members to determine whether the local motor fuel tax provided for in such districts will be collected, and, if so, in what amount (up to the maximum provided in statute).
Title
Transportation districts; membership by portions of counties, etc., collection of motor fuels taxes.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (11-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (8-Y 7-N) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-21 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103111D |