VA HB1862 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Professions and occupations; expiration of certain documents issued to spouses of citizens of Virginia serving in the armed forces of the United States. Provides an extension of the expiration of certain licenses, certifications, registrations or other documents held by the spouse of a member of the armed forces of the United States when the spouse accompanies the citizen for a period of service outside of the country.
Title
Spouse of member of armed forces; provides extension of expiration of certain licenses, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342) | |
2011-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 342 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1862ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103627D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1361 (Same As) 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)