VA HB1854 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1854
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Naming U.S. Route 29; county manager plan of government. Authorizes the board of any locality that has adopted the county manager plan of government (Arlington County) to name any section of U.S. Route 29 located within the boundaries of the locality. The bill provides that the Department of Transportation will place and maintain appropriate signs that will be paid for by the locality.
Title
U.S. Route 29; county manager plan of government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100987D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1854 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)