VA HB1848 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1848

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Human Rights Act; discrimination on the basis of disability. Adds discrimination on the basis of disability as an unlawful discriminatory practice under the Virginia Human Rights Act. The bill also requires employers, defined in the bill, to make reasonable accommodation to the known physical and mental impairments of an otherwise qualified person with a disability, if necessary to assist such person in performing a particular job, unless the employer can demonstrate that the accommodation would impose an undue hardship on the employer. The bill also prohibits employers from taking any adverse action against an employee who requests or uses a reasonable accommodation, from denying employment or promotion opportunities to an otherwise qualified applicant or employee because such employer will be required to make reasonable accommodation to the applicant or employee, or from requiring an employee to take leave if another reasonable accommodation can be provided to the known limitations related to the disability. Virginia Human Rights Act; discrimination on the basis of disability. Adds discrimination on the basis of disability as an unlawful discriminatory practice under the Virginia Human Rights Act. The bill also requires employers, defined in the bill, to make reasonable accommodation to the known physical and mental impairments of an otherwise qualified person with a disability, if necessary to assist such person in performing a particular job, unless the employer can demonstrate that the accommodation would impose an undue hardship on the employer. The bill also prohibits employers from taking any adverse action against an employee who requests or uses a reasonable accommodation, from denying employment or promotion opportunities to an otherwise qualified applicant or employee because such employer will be required to make reasonable accommodation to the applicant or employee, or from requiring an employee to take leave if another reasonable accommodation can be provided to the known limitations related to the disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Human Rights Acts; adds discrimination on the basis of disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
2021-02-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021
2021-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-17SenateSigned by President
2021-02-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1848ER)
2021-02-17HouseEnrolled
2021-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1848H1
2021-01-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21102987D-H1
2021-01-21HouseRead second time
2021-01-20HouseRead first time
2021-01-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 21102987D-H1
2021-01-19HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101176D

Same As/Similar To

HB1848 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223902(n/a)See Bill Text
223905(n/a)See Bill Text
223910(n/a)See Bill Text
51541(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1848
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1848+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1848H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1848ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0012+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1848FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1848FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1101C0001+HB1848
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11C0033+HB1848
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1014+HB1848
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0115+HB1848
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0021+HB1848
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB1848+HB1848
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0020HB1848+HB1848

Bill Comments

feedback