VA HB1848 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1848
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Acts; discrimination on the basis of disability. Adds discrimination on the basis of disability as an unlawful discriminatory practice under the Virginia Human Rights Act. The bill also requires employers, defined in the bill, to make reasonable accommodation to the known physical and mental impairments of an otherwise qualified person with a disability, if necessary to assist such person in performing a particular job, unless the employer can demonstrate that the accommodation would impose an undue hardship on the employer. The bill also prohibits employers from taking any adverse action against an employee who requests or uses a reasonable accommodation, from denying employment or promotion opportunities to an otherwise qualified applicant or employee because such employer will be required to make reasonable accommodation to the applicant or employee, or from requiring an employee to take leave if another reasonable accommodation can be provided to the known limitations related to the disability. Virginia Human Rights Acts; discrimination on the basis of disability. Adds discrimination on the basis of disability as an unlawful discriminatory practice under the Virginia Human Rights Act. The bill also requires employers, defined in the bill, to make reasonable accommodation to the known physical and mental impairments of an otherwise qualified person with a disability, if necessary to assist such person in performing a particular job, unless the employer can demonstrate that the accommodation would impose an undue hardship on the employer. The bill also prohibits employers from taking any adverse action against an employee who requests or uses a reasonable accommodation, from denying employment or promotion opportunities to an otherwise qualified applicant or employee because such employer will be required to make reasonable accommodation to the applicant or employee, or from requiring an employee to take leave if another reasonable accommodation can be provided to the known limitations related to the disability.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Acts; adds discrimination on the basis of disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1848H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21102987D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 21102987D-H1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101176D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1848 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 41 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |