CA AB108 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-22 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2024 by amending Items 0110-001-0001, 0120-011-0001, 0250-496, 0509-001-0001, 0509-495, 0511-001-0001, 0515-495, 0515-496, 0521-101-3228, 0521-131-0001, 0530-001-0001, 0540-001-0001, 0540-101-0001, 0540-495, 0552-001-0001, 0555-495, 0650-001-0001, 0650-001-0140, 0650-001-0890, 0650-001-3228, 0650-001-9740, 0650-101-0890, 0650-101-3228, 0650-490, 0650-495, 0690-103-0001, 0690-496, 0820-001-0001, 0820-001-0367, 0820-001-0567, 0820-015-0001, 0840-495, 0860-002-0001, 0890-001-0890, 0890-101-0890, 2240-001-0001, 2240-001-3144, 2240-121-0001, 2240-495, 2240-496, 2660-108-0042, 2667-001-0046, 2720-496, 2740-496, 3100-001-0001, 3100-490, 3125-001-0568, 3125-101-0286, 3360-001-0890, 3360-001-3117, 3360-001-3228, 3360-101-0890, 3360-101-3117, 3360-101-3228, 3360-491, 3360-003-0890, 3360-103-0890, 3360-496, 3480-001-3046, 3480-002-3046, 3540-001-0001, 3540-301-0001, 3540-492, 3540-496, 3600-001-0001, 3600-490, 3600-495, 3600-497, 3640-101-3228, 3760-490, 3760-495, 3790-001-6029, 3790-002-6029, 3790-101-0001, 3790-301-6029, 3790-490, 3790-491, 3790-495, 3825-490, 3830-490, 3860-001-0001, 3860-001-6083, 3860-101-3228, 3860-301-3228, 3860-301-6088, 3860-495, 3860-496, 3900-011-0115, 3900-491, 3900-495, 3940-001-0193, 3940-001-0306, 3940-001-3058, 3940-102-3228, 3940-490, 3940-497, 3960-001-0014, 3970-001-0133, 3980-001-0001, 3980-001-0044, 4140-101-0001, 4140-495, 4150-001-0933, 4170-001-0289, 4170-101-0001, 4170-102-0942, 4170-495, 4260-001-0001, 4260-001-0890, 4260-001-3428, 4260-101-0001, 4260-101-0890, 4260-101-3428, 4260-101-3431, 4260-116-3397, 4260-118-3428, 4260-495, 4265-001-0001, 4265-111-0001, 4265-495, 4300-001-0001, 4300-101-0001, 4300-495, 4800-101-3381, 5160-001-0001, 5175-101-0001, 5175-101-0890, 5175-495, 5180-001-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-101-0890, 5180-111-0001, 5180-141-0001, 5180-141-0890, 5180-151-0001, 5180-151-0890, 5180-490, 5180-492, 5180-495, 5225-001-0001, 5225-002-0001, 5225-008-0001, 5225-009-0001, 5225-101-0001, 5225-497, 5227-122-0001, 6100-113-0890, 6100-135-0890, 6100-161-0890, 6100-220-0001, 6100-488, 6440-001-0001, 6610-001-0001, 6610-002-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6870-488, 6980-101-0001, 7100-001-0185, 7100-101-0001, 7120-101-0001, 7120-102-0001, 7350-101-3078, 7502-001-0001, 7600-001-3065, 7730-001-0001, 7760-311-3292, 7900-015-0830, 7900-015-0833, 7900-015-0849, 7900-015-0884, 8260-001-0001, 8260-101-0001, 8570-001-6088, 8570-101-0001, 8570-490, 8570-495, and 8855-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of, by adding Items 0509-101-0001, 0555-491, 0559-002-0001, 0650-101-0001, 0680-001-0001, 0680-001-0890, 0680-001-3228, 0680-101-0001, 0680-101-0890, 0680-102-0001, 0690-005-0001, 0690-007-0001, 0690-102-0001, 0690-105-0001, 0840-490, 2240-106-0001, 2240-107-0001, 2240-108-0001, 2660-101-0001, 2660-301-0001, 3125-491, 3360-002-0890, 3360-004-0890, 3360-005-0890, 3360-006-0890, 3360-102-0890, 3360-104-0890, 3360-105-0890, 3540-003-3228, 3540-004-0001, 3540-494, 3560-490, 3640-101-0001, 3640-103-0001, 3640-495, 3760-101-0001, 3760-102-3228, 3790-003-0392, 3790-012-0001, 3860-014-0001, 3860-101-0001, 3900-102-3228, 3940-106-0001, 3960-492, 3970-492, 4140-490, 4260-112-1019, 4265-001-3385, 4265-012-3080, 4265-111-3385, 5225-491, 5225-492, 6100-222-0001, 6120-217-0001, 6360-490, 8885-492, and 9889-011-0001 to Section 2.00 of, by repealing Items 0509-401, 0515-497, 0540-101-3228, 0650-102-0001, 3540-001-3228, 3640-498, 3760-101-3228, 3980-008-0044,4170-011-0289, 4300-490, 5225-011-0678, 6100-495, 7100-495, 7350-401, and 8570-102-3228 of Section 2.00 of, by amending Sections 4.05, 12.00, 13.40, 35.50, 39.00, 99.00, and 99.50 of, and by adding Section 15.80 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 108 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2024-06-20SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2024-06-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-12SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-03-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 832.)
2023-03-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-03-20AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2023-03-20AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2023-03-20AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 732.)
2023-01-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2023-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback