NY A07537 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - print number 7537a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - print number 7537a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits utility corporations from imposing late fees, interest, or penalties during an investigation by the commission; allows retroactive late fees, interest, or penalties if a determination is made in favor of such utility corporation; prohibits utility services from being terminated during an investigation by the commission; requires utility corporations to notify customers of investigations; requires notice to the general public.
Title
Prohibits utility corporations from imposing late fees, interest, or penalties during an investigation by the commission; allows retroactive late fees, interest, or penalties if a determination is made in favor of such utility corporation; prohibits utility services from being terminated during an investigation by the commission; requires utility corporations to notify customers of investigations; requires notice to the general public.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Assembly | print number 7537a |
2024-03-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06803 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 6803A