VA HB1811 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Child care services; reimbursement rates. Directs the Department of Social Services to identify strategies to increase reimbursement rates for child care services for TANF recipients and families whose incomes are at or below 185 percent of the federal poverty level to an amount comparable to the goal identified by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and directs the Department to develop criteria for determining an appropriate local match for funds available for child care services for such TANF recipients and families.
Title
Child care services; DSS to identify strategies to increase reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102633D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1811 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1811+hil |