VA HB1806 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Award of credit; applied music study in piano. Requires the Board of Education to provide for the award of a standard unit of elective credit for achieving an independently verified level of proficiency in the applied music study of piano. The credit must only be awarded (i) if the student performs a minimum of two memorized pieces in the Virginia Music Teachers Association's annual Concerto Competition and achieves a passing score and (ii) completes any other requirements established by the Board.
Title
Award of credit; Board of Education to provide an elective credit for applied music study of piano.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Education | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100207D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1806 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1806+hil |