VA HB1800 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Open-end lending by banks, savings institutions, and credit unions; credit cards; grace period. Adjusts the period used in determining whether a borrower has repaid his open-end credit card balance in full and therefore is exempt from a finance charge on purchases of merchandise or services. The measure provides that a bank, savings institution, or credit union shall not impose a finance charge on purchases of merchandise or services by credit card if payment in full of the unpaid balance owing for extensions of credit is received prior to the payment due date and requires the payment due date to be at least 25 days later than the billing date. The requirement for a 25-day grace period for payments on an open-end credit plan by a credit union that does not involve a credit card is deleted. Under existing law, the next billing date, rather than the payment due date, applies.
Title
Open-end lending by banks, savings institutions, etc.; determining grace period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N 1-A) (Y: 6 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N 1-A) (Y: 6 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 454 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1800ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105587D-H2 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Chafin, McWaters, Dance |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Delegates: Villanueva, Byron, Sickles |
2015-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-25 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N 1-A) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15104055D-S1 (5-Y 92-N 1-A) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1800S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104055D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104055D-S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1800H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104055D-H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104055D-H1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102518D |
Same As/Similar To
SB859 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)