VA HB179 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; permanent farm use placard. Requires an owner or lessee of a vehicle claiming a farm use exemption from the registration, licensing, and decal requirements for a motor vehicle, trailer, or semitrailer to obtain a nontransferable permanent farm use placard from the Department of Motor Vehicles and to display the farm use placard on the vehicle at all times. The bill requires the applicant to provide specified information about the vehicle and its usage, pay a $15 fee, and certify that the vehicle is insured. The provisions of the bill requiring the owner or lessee of a farm vehicle to obtain and display a farm use placard have a delayed effective date of July 1, 2023.
Title
Permanent farm use placard; an owner or lessee to obtain for vehicle from DMV.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 52 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB179ER) |
2022-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB179H1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105384D-H1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-27 | House | Incorporates HB33 (Campbell, R.R.) |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105384D-H1 |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101251D |
Same As/Similar To
HB33 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
HB33 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
SB186 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
SB186 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
HB33 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
SB186 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
SB186 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 665 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 666 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 670 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 672 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 673 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 684.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |