VA HB1783 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Forestry; conveyance of easement; Buckingham County. Authorizes the conveyance of a right-of-way easement from the Department of Forestry to Robert H. Whistleman and Karen L. Whistleman. The easement, which will follow an existing road across a portion of the Appomattox-Buckingham State Forest, will allow ingress and egress and access for utilities from State Route 24 to the Whistlemans' property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forestry, Department of; conveyance of easement in Buckingham County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 73 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1783ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1783H1
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105033D-H1
2019-01-28HouseRead second time
2019-01-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105033D-H1
2019-01-23HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-27HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-12-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101588D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1783
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1783+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1783H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1783ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0073+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0102V0003+HB1783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0016+HB1783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1938+HB1783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0227+HB1783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1783+HB1783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB1783+HB1783

Bill Comments

feedback