VA HB1768 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of title; vehicle used as a taxicab. Removes the requirement that the owner of a vehicle that has been used as a taxicab attach a statement to that effect to the certificate of title of the vehicle prior to the sale, transfer, or disposal of such vehicle. The bill also removes the requirement that the Department of Motor Vehicles place an indicator on any new certificate of title for the vehicle indicating such prior use.
Title
Certificate of title; vehicle used as a taxicab.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 72 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1768ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 19-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-12-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101411D |