VA HB1756 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB1906-Miller, J.H.) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB1906-Miller, J.H.) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Retail sales tax exemption; gold and silver bullion coins. Establishes a retail sales tax exemption for sales of nongraded United States gold or silver bullion coins.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for sales of nongraded U.S. gold or silver bullion coins.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1906-Miller, J.H.) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | House: Incorporated by Finance (HB1906-Miller, J.H.) by voice vote | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1906-Miller, J.H.) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102843D |