VA HB1750 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expanded access to investigational drugs, biological products, and devices. Provides that a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device may make such drug, product, or device available to a person who has a terminal condition when (i) the person has, in consultation with his treating physician, considered all other treatment options currently approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration and the treating physician has determined that no reasonable opportunity exists for him to participate in an ongoing clinical trial; (ii) the potential benefits of use of the investigational drug, biological product, or device to treat his terminal condition are greater than the potential risks; (iii) the person has received a recommendation from his treating physician for use of such drug, product, or device for treatment of his terminal condition; and (iv) the person has provided written informed consent. The bill provides that a manufacturer that provides such drug, product, or device may provide the drug, product, or device free of charge or may require the person to pay costs associated with its manufacture and provides that health insurance providers may, but are not required to, provide coverage for costs associated with use of such drug, product, or device. For a health care provider who recommends an investigational drug, biological product, or device and for a manufacturer, distributor, administrator, health care provider, sponsor, or physician who manufactures, supplies, distributes, administers, prescribes, or recommends such drug, product, or device, the bill provides immunity from civil liability and provides that no claim or cause of action shall exist in any state court for claims of property, personal injury, or death caused by, arising out of, or relating to the design, development, clinical testing and investigation, manufacture, labeling, distribution, sale, purchase, donation, dispensing, prescription, recommendation, administration, efficacy, or use of such drug, product, or device to a person who meets eligibility under the law. The bill provides that no health care provider who recommends, prescribes, administers, distributes, or supplies an investigational drug, biological product, or device shall be deemed to have engaged in unprofessional conduct or shall be adversely affected in any decision relating to licensure on such grounds and provides that nothing shall require any person to violate or act in contravention of any federal or state law as such law relates to the prescribing, dispensing, administration, or use of an investigational drug, biological product, or device.
Title
Investigational drugs; expanded access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1750ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105265D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1750S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105265D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105265D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15100033D-E |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1750E |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100033D |
Same As/Similar To
SB732 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3442.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |