VA HB1747 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1747
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Clinical nurse specialist; licensure; practice. Changes from the requirement of registration as clinical nurse specialists to the licensure of nurse practitioners as clinical nurse specialists by the Boards of Medicine and Nursing and provides that a nurse practitioner licensed as a clinical nurse specialist shall practice pursuant to a practice agreement between the clinical nurse specialist and a licensed physician and in a manner consistent with the standards of care for the profession and applicable law and regulations. For the transition of registration to licensure, the bill requires the Boards of Medicine and Nursing to jointly issue a license to practice as a nurse practitioner in the category of a clinical nurse specialist to an applicant who is an advance practice registered nurse who has completed an advanced graduate-level education program in the specialty category of clinical nurse specialist and who is registered by the Board of Nursing as a clinical nurse specialist on July 1, 2021. Clinical nurse specialist; licensure; practice. Changes from the requirement of registration as clinical nurse specialists to the licensure of nurse practitioners as clinical nurse specialists by the Boards of Medicine and Nursing and provides that a nurse practitioner licensed as a clinical nurse specialist shall practice pursuant to a practice agreement between the clinical nurse specialist and a licensed physician and in a manner consistent with the standards of care for the profession and applicable law and regulations. For the transition of registration to licensure, the bill requires the Boards of Medicine and Nursing to jointly issue a license to practice as a nurse practitioner in the category of a clinical nurse specialist to an applicant who is an advance practice registered nurse who has completed an advanced graduate-level education program in the specialty category of clinical nurse specialist and who is registered by the Board of Nursing as a clinical nurse specialist on July 1, 2021.
Title
Clinical nurse specialist; licensure of nurse practitioners as specialists, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. John Avoli [R] | Del. Amanda Batten [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Sen. Emily Brewer [R] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Carrie Coyner [R] |
Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Martha Mugler [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Del. Michael Webert [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Printed as engrossed 21100541D-E |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1747E |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1747E |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100541D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1747 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3018.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |