VA HB1747 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1747

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Clinical nurse specialist; licensure; practice. Changes for clinical nurse specialists the requirement to register with the Board of Nursing as a clinical nurse specialist to licensure by the Boards of Medicine and Nursing to practice as a nurse practitioner in the category of clinical nurse specialist and provides that a nurse practitioner licensed as a clinical nurse specialist shall practice pursuant to a practice agreement between the clinical nurse specialist and a licensed physician and in a manner consistent with the standards of care for the profession and applicable law and regulations. For the transition of registration to licensure, the bill requires the Boards of Medicine and Nursing to jointly issue a license to practice as a nurse practitioner in the category of a clinical nurse specialist to an applicant who is an advance practice registered nurse who has completed an advanced graduate-level education program in the specialty category of clinical nurse specialist and who is registered by the Board of Nursing as a clinical nurse specialist on July 1, 2021. Clinical nurse specialist; licensure; practice. Changes for clinical nurse specialists the requirement to register with the Board of Nursing as a clinical nurse specialist to licensure by the Boards of Medicine and Nursing to practice as a nurse practitioner in the category of clinical nurse specialist and provides that a nurse practitioner licensed as a clinical nurse specialist shall practice pursuant to a practice agreement between the clinical nurse specialist and a licensed physician and in a manner consistent with the standards of care for the profession and applicable law and regulations. For the transition of registration to licensure, the bill requires the Boards of Medicine and Nursing to jointly issue a license to practice as a nurse practitioner in the category of a clinical nurse specialist to an applicant who is an advance practice registered nurse who has completed an advanced graduate-level education program in the specialty category of clinical nurse specialist and who is registered by the Board of Nursing as a clinical nurse specialist on July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clinical nurse specialist; licensure of nurse practitioners as specialists, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 157 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1747ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18HousePrinted as engrossed 21100541D-E
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1747E
2021-01-18HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1747E
2021-01-18HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-18HouseRead second time
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2020-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100541D

Same As/Similar To

HB1747 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412900(n/a)See Bill Text
5412901(n/a)See Bill Text
5412957(n/a)See Bill Text
5412957.01(n/a)See Bill Text
5413000(n/a)See Bill Text
5413018.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1747
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1747+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1747E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1747ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0157+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1747AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1747F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1747FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1747FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0026+HB1747
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC0954+HB1747
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0117+HB1747
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0056+HB1747
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB1747+HB1747
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0266HB1747+HB1747

Bill Comments

feedback