VA HB1681 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Zero-Based Budgeting. Whenever a state agency which receives General Fund revenue requests the Governor or his designee for funding to be included in the Governor's next Executive Budget, the state agency shall submit its budget request utilizing a zero-based budgeting methodology.
Title
State agencies; those submitting budget request to utilize zero-based budgeting methodology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100341D |