VA HB1664 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Products liability; when cause of action accrues. Provides that a cause of action for personal injury based on products liability accrues from the later of the date of the injury or the date that the product defect is publicized by the product's maker.
Title
Products liability; when cause of action accrues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101685D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1664 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1664+hil |