VA HB1652 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord remedies; noncompliance with rental agreement. Increases from five days to 14 days the mandatory waiting period after a landlord serves written notice on a tenant notifying the tenant of his nonpayment of rent and of the landlord's intention to terminate the rental agreement if rent is not paid before the landlord may pursue remedies for termination of the rental agreement.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord & Tenant Act; landlord remedies, noncompliance with rental agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in General Laws |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100297D |