VA HB1612 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Scenic Rivers System; Grays Creek. Designates a six-mile portion of Grays Creek in Surry County as a component of the Virginia Scenic Rivers System.
Title
Grays Creek; designating as component of Virginia Scenic Rivers System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 6-N) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 322 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1612ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105336D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1090 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)