VA SB1090 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Scenic Rivers System; Grays Creek. Designates a six-mile portion of Grays Creek in Surry County as a component of the Virginia Scenic Rivers System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grays Creek; designating as component of Virginia Scenic Rivers System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
2020-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 457 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1090ER)
2020-02-27SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (86-Y 11-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House (86-Y 11-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
2020-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1090S1
2020-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106863D-S1
2020-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-31SenateRead second time
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106863D-S1
2020-01-28SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 2-N)
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20106067D

Same As/Similar To

HB1612 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101411.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback