VA HB1577 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
TANF; restrictions on use of cash assistance. Prohibits the use of Temporary Assistance for Needy Families benefits in any electronic benefit transaction (i) for the purchase of alcoholic beverages, tobacco products, lottery tickets, or sexually explicit visual materials or (ii) in any government store established for the sale of alcoholic beverages, establishment in which pari-mutuel wagering or charitable gaming is conducted, establishment in which tattooing or body-piercing is performed for hire or consideration, or adult entertainment establishment in which performers appear nude or partially nude.
Title
TANF; restrictions on use of cash assistance, not to access cash through electronic transaction.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Richard Bell [R] |
Del. Scott Garrett [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 733 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1577ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-12 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1577ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1577H1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104279D-H1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Incorporates HB1307 |
2013-01-22 | House | Incorporates HB2153 |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104279D-H1 |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #3 |
2013-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101969D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1307 (Similar To) 2013-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB2153 (Similar To) 2013-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
SB1180 (Same As) 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
HB2153 (Similar To) 2013-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
SB1180 (Same As) 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)