VA SB1180 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

TANF; restrictions on use of cash assistance. Prohibits the use of Temporary Assistance for Needy Families benefits in any electronic benefit transaction (i) for the purchase of alcoholic beverages, tobacco products, lottery tickets, or sexually explicit visual materials or (ii) in any government store established for the sale of alcoholic beverages, establishment in which pari-mutuel wagering or charitable gaming is conducted, establishment in which tattooing or body-piercing is performed for hire or consideration, or adult entertainment establishment in which performers appear nude or partially nude.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF; restrictions on use of cash assistance, not to access cash through electronic transaction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 72 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
2013-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 160 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-23SenateSigned by President
2013-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1180ER)
2013-02-22SenateEnrolled
2013-02-19SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-19SenateReconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-19SenateTitle replaced 13105017D-H1
2013-02-19SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2013-02-18HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-18HousePassed House with substitute (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-18HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1180H1
2013-02-18HouseCommittee substitute #2 ruled moot 13105215D-H2
2013-02-18HouseCommittee substitute #1 agreed to 13105017D-H1
2013-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 30-N)
2013-02-18HousePrevious question ordered by Delegate Orrock agreed to (70-Y 30-N)
2013-02-18HouseRead third time
2013-02-15HouseRead second time
2013-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 13105215D-H2
2013-02-14HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2013-02-12HouseRereferred to Health, Welfare and Institutions
2013-02-12HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2013-02-11HousePassed by for the day
2013-02-08HouseRead second time
2013-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 13105017D-H1
2013-02-07HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2013-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2013-01-25HouseRead first time
2013-01-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-01-23SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-01-22SenateRead second time and engrossed
2013-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2013-01-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2013-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2013-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103680D

Same As/Similar To

HB1577 (Same As) 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632621(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+SB1180
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1180+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1180H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1180H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1180ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0160+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S09V0015+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0091SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0129SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H12V0089+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H12V0116+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1001+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1002+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0670SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0683SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0684SB1180+SB1180

Bill Comments 750

feedback