VA HB1307 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
TANF; restrictions on use of cash assistance. Prohibits the use of Temporary Assistance for Needy Families cash assistance paid to an eligible recipient (i) for the purchase of alcoholic beverages, tobacco products, or lottery tickets or (ii) in any transaction in any government store established for the sale of alcoholic beverages, establishment in which pari-mutuel wagering or charitable gaming is conducted, or adult entertainment establishment in which performers appear nude or partially nude.
Title
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF); restrictions on use of cash assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1577-Wilt) by voice vote |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #3 |
2012-08-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2012-08-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100179D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1577 (Similar To) 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1307 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1307+hil |