VA HB1535 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Overtime compensation; penalties. Requires an employer to compensate its employees who are entitled to overtime compensation under the federal Fair Labor Standards Act at a rate not less than one and one-half times the employee's regular rate of pay for any hours worked in excess of 40 hours in any one workweek. The sanctions for an employer's failure to pay such overtime wages, including civil and criminal penalties, are the same as currently provided for failing to pay wages generally.
Title
Overtime compensation; penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (3-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105226D |