VA HB1531 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Speed limits in school zones. Allows counties in Planning District 8 to increase or decrease the speed limits in school zones; current law allows cities and towns to do so.
Title
Speed limits in school crossing zones; counties allowed to increase or decrease.
Sponsors
Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Michael Futrell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 91-N) (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 91-N) (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 459 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1531ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senators: Watkins, Carrico, Favola |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Delegates: Minchew, LaRock, Plum |
2015-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 91-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105067D-S1 (2-Y 91-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1531S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105067D-S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104901D-S1 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1531H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104021D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104021D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102736D |
Same As/Similar To
SB803 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460)