VA HB1485 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DMV fees. Allows the DMV Commissioner to postpone expiration of vehicle registration if DMV is unable to operate for reasons beyond its control and the postponement is authorized by the Governor.
Title
DMV registration; expiration and renewal.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1485ER) |
2013-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1485H1 |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104044D-H1 |
2013-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104044D-H1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #3 |
2013-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101789D |