VA HB1464 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Compensation for wrongful incarceration for a felony conviction. Establishes a process for a person wrongfully incarcerated to submit a written request to the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia for the disbursement of the transition assistance grant of $15,000 for payment from the Criminal Fund; provides a 30-day timeframe, or as soon as practicable, within which such grant must be paid; and removes the provision that such grant amount be deducted from any compensation awarded for wrongful incarceration. Current law does not specify the process for the person wrongfully incarcerated to receive such grant.
Title
Felony conviction; compensation for wrongful incarceration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-12-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-12-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100901D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 195.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 195.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 195.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 195.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1464 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1464+hil |