VA HB1457 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Estate tax reinstated. Reinstates the estate tax for persons dying on or after July 1, 2013. No estate tax will be imposed on a gross estate if the majority of the assets of the estate is an interest in a closely held business or a working farm. The revenues from the estate tax would first be used for funding the Medicaid cost of meeting staffing standards in nursing homes required to be established under the bill, which staffing standards would require a minimum period of time of direct care services to each resident per 24-hour period. Five percent of the remaining revenues shall be used to fund home-based and community-based services to enable older adults and people with disabilities to remain in home settings.
Title
Estate tax; reinstates for persons dying on or after July 1, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | House | Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2012-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101810D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 912 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1457 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1457+hil |