VA HB145 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of physician assistants. Removes the requirement that physician assistants appointed as medical examiners practice as part of a patient care team. For hospice program licensing, the bill adds physician assistants to the list of hospice personnel who may be part of a medically directed interdisciplinary team. The bill removes a reference to physician assistants in the definition of patient care team podiatrist. Finally, the bill permits physician assistants working in the field of orthopedics as part of a patient care team to utilize fluoroscopy for guidance of diagnostic and therapeutic procedures, provided other requirements are met. Practice of physician assistants. Removes the requirement that physician assistants appointed as medical examiners practice as part of a patient care team. For hospice program licensing, the bill adds physician assistants to the list of hospice personnel who may be part of a medically directed interdisciplinary team. The bill removes a reference to physician assistants in the definition of patient care team podiatrist. Finally, the bill permits physician assistants working in the field of orthopedics as part of a patient care team to utilize fluoroscopy for guidance of diagnostic and therapeutic procedures, provided other requirements are met.
Title
Physician assistants; practice.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB145ER) |
2022-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 22101644D-E |
2022-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB145E |
2022-01-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101644D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 162.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 282 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2952 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |