VA HB1398 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Air pollution emissions. Defers to the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) the enforcement of any carbon dioxide standards or cap and trade provisions that are included in the federal Clean Air Act. The Governor through an executive order or the General Assembly is prohibited from enforcing any climate change international agreement until such agreement is part of an international treaty that has been approved by the U.S. Senate. The bill requires the Governor, in consultation with the Attorney General, to examine these provisions and determine whether Congress has the authority to enact mandates upon the state. The Governor is to report his findings to the General Assembly. The bill authorizes the Attorney General to bring an action against the EPA if he finds that the mandated standards are based on a finding that is not scientifically demonstrated.
Title
Carbon dioxide emissions; defers USEPA enforcement of any standards or cap and trade provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2010-07-21 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-07-21 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100041D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1306.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1398 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1398+hil |